Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Lambruschini

Deceased

Archbishop of Perugia, Italy

Bishop of Cittą della Pieve


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1911Born
7 Dec 193322.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 196857.5AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
15 Oct 196857.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
8 Dec 196857.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
3 Jun 197766.1AppointedBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
25 Jul 198170.2DiedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Lambruschini
Archbishop Ferdinando Lambruschini (born , died ) Archbishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSestri Levante
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 285
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 363, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 524, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast