Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bernard Brunini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1909BornVicksburg, MS
5 Dec 193324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
28 Nov 195647.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
28 Nov 195647.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Axomis
29 Jan 195747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axomis
2 Dec 196758.4AppointedBishop of Natchez-Jackson, Mississippi, USA
24 Jan 198474.5RetiredBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
7 Jan 199686.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bernard Brunini:
Bishop Joseph Bernard Brunini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jackson

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013