Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Monas Maloney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1912Born
8 Dec 193624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
5 Nov 196048.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
5 Nov 196048.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
4 Jan 196148.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
2 Dec 196755.7AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
16 Jul 198270.3ResignedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
15 Feb 199582.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for David Monas Maloney
Bishop David Monas Maloney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLittleton, CO

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast