Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Loras Thomas Lane

Deceased

Bishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1910Born
19 Mar 193726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
29 May 195140.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
29 May 195140.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
20 Aug 195140.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
11 Oct 195645.9AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
20 Nov 195646.0InstalledBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
22 Jul 196857.7DiedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Loras Thomas Lane
Bishop Loras Thomas Lane (born , died ) Bishop of Rockford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCascade, IA

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/i/d: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018