Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Lemay, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bougainville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1909BornLawrence, MA, USA
15 Apr 193323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
14 Jun 196050.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands, Papua New Guinea
14 Jun 196050.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
21 Sep 196050.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
15 Nov 196657.1AppointedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
1 Jul 197464.7ResignedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
9 Sep 198373.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Leo Lemay:
Bishop Leo Lemay S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bougainville

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015