Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wilfrid J. Dufault, A.A. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Augustinians of the Assumption


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1907Born
1929²21.0ProfessedMember of Augustinians of the Assumption
1933²25.0Perpetual VowsMember of Augustinians of the Assumption
24 Feb 193426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
195244.0AppointedSuperior General of Augustinians of the Assumption
196961.0ResignedSuperior General of Augustinians of the Assumption
24 Feb 200496.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Augustinians of the Assumption

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilfrid J. Dufault (VIAF: 6943936)
Father Wilfrid J. Dufault A.A. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Augustinians of the Assumption

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpencer, MA, USA
Buried Place (Original)Saint Anne, Cemetery, Sturbridge, MA, USA

  • a priest for 70.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Aug 2019

Quantcast