Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edward Aloysius Cardinal Mooney

Deceased

Archbishop of Detroit, Michigan

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1882BornMount Savage, MD
10 Apr 190926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
18 Jan 192643.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
18 Jan 192643.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
31 Jan 192643.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
30 Mar 193148.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Japan
28 Aug 193351.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Rochester, New York, USA
26 May 193755.0AppointedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
18 Feb 194663.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194663.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
25 Oct 195876.4DiedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Aloysius Mooney:
Edward Aloysius Cardinal Mooney (born , died ) Archbishop of Detroit

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015