Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Patrick Cardinal Cody

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1907Born
8 Dec 193123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
10 May 194739.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
10 May 194739.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
2 Jul 194739.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
19 Jan 195446.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
9 May 195547.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
24 Aug 195648.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
11 Sep 195648.7SucceededBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
10 Aug 196153.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
10 Aug 196153.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
1 Jun 196254.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
8 Nov 196456.8AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
14 Jun 196557.4AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
26 Jun 196759.5Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196759.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
25 Apr 198274.3DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Cody (VIAF: 18551652)
John Patrick Cardinal Cody (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Louis, MO, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Chapel, Mount Carmel, Cemetery, Hillside, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 65
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 290, Ascendance
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast