Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilaire Felder, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1867Born
21 Sep 189023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Apr 193870.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
13 Jun 193870.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
27 Nov 195184.3DiedTitular Bishop of Geras

MicroData Summary for Hilaire Felder
Bishop Hilaire Felder O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Geras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEich, Switzerland

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast