Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Collignon, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Les Cayes, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1904Born
28 Jun 193126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Sep 194238.1AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
21 Nov 194238.2Ordained BishopBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
27 Jul 196661.9DiedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Joseph Collignon
Bishop Jean Louis Joseph Collignon O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Les Cayes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuxy, Belgium

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018