Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Dougherty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Cotenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1907Born
23 Jul 193325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
17 Nov 196255.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
17 Nov 196255.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
24 Jan 196355.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
18 Sep 198275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Mar 198678.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Dougherty (VIAF: 97779815)
Bishop John Joseph Dougherty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast