Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olaf Offerdahl

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

Titular Bishop of Selia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1857Born
22 Nov 189133.9Ordained PriestPriest of Norvegia (Norway)
11 Oct 192870.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
12 Mar 193072.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
3 Apr 193072.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
6 Apr 193072.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
7 Oct 193072.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

MicroData Summary for Olaf Offerdahl
Bishop Olaf Offerdahl (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÅrdal i Sogn

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast