Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Norton

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1891BornLucan, Ireland
20 Jun 191524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
8 Mar 192635.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bathurst, Australia
8 Mar 192635.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lunda
18 Apr 192635.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lunda
3 Apr 192837.2SucceededBishop of Bathurst, Australia
20 Jun 196372.4DiedBishop of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Francis Norton:
Bishop John Francis Norton (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/s/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013