Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Alibrandi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Binda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1914Born
1 Nov 193622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
5 Oct 196147.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Binda
5 Oct 196147.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
8 Dec 196147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Binda
9 Dec 196349.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
19 Apr 196955.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
14 Jan 198975.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
3 Jul 200389.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Alibrandi
Archbishop Gaetano Alibrandi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Ireland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione di Sicilia

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017