Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista della Pietra, S.J. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1871Born
18 Sep 190432.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Mar 192755.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
3 Mar 192755.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Albania
19 Mar 192755.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
1934¹62.2ResignedApostolic Delegate to Albania
26 Aug 194068.8DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista della Pietra
Archbishop Giovanni Battista della Pietra S.J. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Albania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornegliano, Italy

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1927, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017