Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Eugène-Charles-Joseph de Mazenod, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1782Born Aix-en-Provence
21 Dec 181129.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
181633.4AppointedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1 Oct 183250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Icosium
14 Oct 183250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Icosium
20 Apr 183754.7SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
2 Oct 183755.2ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
21 May 186178.8DiedBishop of Marseille, France
19 Oct 1975Beatified
3 Dec 1995Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Eugène-Charles-Joseph de Mazenod:
Bishop St. Eugène-Charles-Joseph de Mazenod O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Marseille

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 222, and Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013