Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Donovan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1911Born
8 Dec 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 195443.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
6 Sep 195443.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhasus
26 Oct 195443.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhasus
25 Feb 196755.5AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
29 Jul 198068.9ResignedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
18 Sep 199180.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Donovan
Bishop John Anthony Donovan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toledo (in America)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Canada

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast