Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent John Baldwin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York

Titular Bishop of Bencenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1907BornBrooklyn
26 Jul 193124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Jun 196254.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
4 Jun 196254.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
26 Jul 196255.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
5 Jun 197971.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
16 Sep 197972.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent John Baldwin:
Bishop Vincent John Baldwin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015