Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Cassata

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Worth, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1908Born
8 Dec 193224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston, Texas, USA
12 Mar 196859.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas, USA
12 Mar 196859.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
5 Jun 196859.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
22 Aug 196960.7AppointedBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
16 Sep 198071.8ResignedBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
8 Sep 198980.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Worth, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Cassata
Bishop John Joseph Cassata (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Worth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalveston, Diocese of Galveston, Texas
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast