Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Beretti

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1877Born
17 Dec 189922.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 193659.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
4 Jul 193659.0AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
19 Jul 193659.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
25 Nov 194972.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Pamphylia
27 Apr 195577.8DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Francesco Beretti
Archbishop Francesco Beretti (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast