Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Alexander Floersh

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky

Titular Archbishop of Sistroniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1886BornNashville, TN
10 Jun 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 192336.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
6 Feb 192336.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
8 Apr 192336.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
26 Jul 192437.8SucceededBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
10 Dec 193751.1AppointedArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
25 Feb 196780.3RetiredArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
25 Feb 196780.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sistroniana
11 Jun 196881.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for John Alexander Floersh:
Archbishop John Alexander Floersh (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Louisville

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1923, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015