Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Rodríguez Castañón

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1615³BornLois
21 Dec 165742.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 166348.3SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Nov 166348.8ConfirmedBishop of Orense, Spain
Feb 1664³49.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Dec 166752.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
1669¹53.9DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rodríguez Castañón:
Bishop Francisco Rodríguez Castañón (born ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 11.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 104, and Page 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 197, Number 1,238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013