Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel José Irigoyen

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1785Born
1809¹23.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 184762.4SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
17 Dec 184762.6ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
19 Mar 184862.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
23 Feb 185064.8SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
20 May 185065.0ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
18 Feb 185266.7DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel José Irigoyen
Bishop Miguel José Irigoyen (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErrazu, Diocese of Pamplona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pamplona, Diocese of Pamplona

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 170, and Page 601
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 839
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast