Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Esparza Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1606BornPamplona
27 Jan 165952.6AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
13 Mar 166255.7AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
2 Jun 167063.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
10 Jan 168679.5DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Esparza Pérez:
Bishop Gabriel de Esparza Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 301
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013