Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando González

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1300AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Jul 1300Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
6 May 1303DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando González:
Bishop Fernando González (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 156
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 299, Number 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014