Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Delgado López

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514²Born
13 Jun 156147.4AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
11 Jan 156248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
26 Apr 156652.3AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
2 Oct 157662.7DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Delgado López
Bishop Francisco Delgado López (born 1514, died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastildelgado, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceBaeza

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 72, Number 420
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229, and Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast