Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cipriano Juárez y Berzosa

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1787BornVillaherreros
1815¹27.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 185264.5SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
27 Sep 185265.0ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Dec 185265.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
23 May 185870.7DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Juárez y Berzosa:
Bishop Cipriano Juárez y Berzosa (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013