Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abilio Martínez Varea

Bishop of Osma-Soria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1964 Born
30 Sep 198925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
5 Jan 201752.9AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
11 Mar 201753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Abilio Martínez Varea
Bishop Abilio Martínez Varea (born ) Bishop of Osma-Soria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutol, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño
Ordained BishopCathedral, Osma, Diocese of Osma-Soria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osma-Soria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017