Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Sebastián Aguilar, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1929Born
8 Sep 194616.7ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
28 Jun 195323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
22 Aug 197949.6AppointedBishop of León, Spain
29 Sep 197949.7Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
28 Jul 198353.6ResignedBishop of León, Spain
8 Apr 198858.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Granada, Spain
15 Sep 199161.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Málaga, Spain
26 Mar 199363.2AppointedArchbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
23 May 199363.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Málaga, Spain
15 Sep 200373.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
29 May 200474.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
31 Jul 200777.6RetiredArchbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
22 Feb 201484.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici
22 Feb 201484.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Sep 201484.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angela Merici
24 Jan 201989.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Sebastián Aguilar (VIAF: 21425212)
Fernando Cardinal Sebastián Aguilar C.M.F. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pamplona y Tudela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalatayud, Diocese of Tarazona (-Tudela)
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, León, Diocese of León
Death PlaceMálaga, Diocese of Málaga

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2014
  • d: CB, 24 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 25 Jan 2019

Quantcast