Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego González Samaniego

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1599AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
11 Jul 1599Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
22 Oct 1611DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego González Samaniego
Bishop Diego González Samaniego (died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamaniego or Villaescuerna, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopLeón, Diocese of León

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 112, Number 714
  • c4: CB, 19 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast