Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Piñeiro Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1598BornVillena
13 Jul 164344.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
4 Oct 164345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Oct 164749.1AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Dec 164749.3DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Piñeiro Osorio:
Bishop Juan Piñeiro Osorio (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,856
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128, and Page 271
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 172, Number 1,070

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015