Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Sarmiento de Osacastro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1548AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
7 Apr 1549Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
19 Oct 1557DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Martín Sarmiento de Osacastro
Bishop Martín Sarmiento de Osacastro O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Rioja, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopOaxaca, Diocese of Antequera, Oaxaca
Death PlaceSan Felipe, Ixtaquixtla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 61, Number 344
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast