Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan González de Mendoza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²Born
31 May 159348.4AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
7 Jun 159348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
24 May 159954.3ResignedBishop of Lipari, Italy
7 May 160762.3AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
17 Nov 160863.8AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
14 Feb 161873.1DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan González de Mendoza (VIAF: 69024318)
Bishop Juan González de Mendoza O.S.A. (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrecilla de Cameros, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePopayán, Diocese of Popayán

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 222, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 156
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 106, Number 668
  • bp/bd/r: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast