Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toribio Minguella y Arnedo, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis

Note/Previous Titular See: (de la Virgen de la Merced)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1836BornIgea de Cornago, Spain
17 Jun 185923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
21 May 189458.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
5 Aug 189458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Mar 189861.9AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
22 Aug 191680.3RetiredBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
22 Aug 191680.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
16 Jul 192084.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Toribio Minguella y Arnedo:
Bishop Toribio Minguella y Arnedo O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 464, and Page 511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013