Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Martínez de Cenicero

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Apr 1597AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
13 Aug 1607AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
3 Aug 1615AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
28 Nov 1617DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Martínez de Cenicero
Bishop Francisco Martínez de Cenicero (died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCenicero, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Death PlaceJaén, Diocese of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 132, and Page 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 110, Number 699
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 844
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 42
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast