Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cruz Ruiz de Cabañas y Crespo

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1752Born
12 Sep 179442.3AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
19 Apr 179542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
18 Dec 179543.6AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Jul 179644.2InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Nov 182472.5DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Cruz Ruiz de Cabañas y Crespo
Bishop Juan Cruz Ruiz de Cabañas y Crespo (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspronceda, Spain

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 112, Number 587
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,795, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230, and Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast