Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista de Zengotita y Bengoa, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1736BornBérriz, Spain
Sep 174913.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1 Jun 179558.7AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
8 Nov 179559.2Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1 Nov 180266.1DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista de Zengotita y Bengoa:
Bishop Juan Bautista de Zengotita y Bengoa O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 113, Number 594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013