Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Ferrero Malo, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1846Born
18 Dec 186923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
24 Mar 189851.3AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
13 Nov 189851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaro, Philippines
12 Jun 190356.5ResignedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
22 Dec 190963.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Andrés Ferrero Malo
Bishop Andrés Ferrero Malo O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnedo, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopManila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast