Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Rojas y Contreras

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1700BornValladolid
6 May 174847.7AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
11 Aug 174848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Mar 175352.6AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
10 Nov 177272.2DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Diego Rojas y Contreras:
Bishop Diego Rojas y Contreras (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 66, Number 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138, and Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015