Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María García Escudero y Ubago

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1847Born
18 Sep 186922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
19 Apr 189750.2AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
29 Jun 189750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
22 Mar 190962.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María García Escudero y Ubago (VIAF: 259892780)
Bishop José María García Escudero y Ubago (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadarán, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopLogroño

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017