Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luis Ozta Múzquiz

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1742³BornElvetea
27 Jun 178542.7AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
24 Aug 178542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
20 Jan 178946.2DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luis Ozta Múzquiz:
Bishop Pedro Luis Ozta Múzquiz (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 103, Number 533
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016