Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio María Cardinal Aguirre y García, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1835Born
1857²21.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
Sep 1859³24.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
27 Mar 188550.0AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
21 Jun 188550.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
21 May 189459.1AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Aug 189459.4InstalledArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
2 Dec 189964.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
15 Apr 190772.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 190772.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
29 Apr 190974.1AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
29 Apr 190974.1AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
10 Oct 191378.5DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio María Aguirre y García (VIAF: 88966241)
Gregorio María Cardinal Aguirre y García O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePola de Gordón, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopSan Fernando, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 350
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017