Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Espejo y Cisneros

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1657³BornAlhama de Murcia
4 Jun 168932.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Apr 169134.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 171457.0SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
28 May 171457.1ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
25 Jul 171457.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
2 Jul 171760.2AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
8 Apr 174790.0RetiredBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
20 Dec 174891.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Espejo y Cisneros:
Bishop José Espejo y Cisneros (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,638
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,878
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 30, Number 82
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135, and Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015