Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Mateo Aguiriano Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1742Born
15 Apr 177633.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
15 Apr 177633.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
26 May 177633.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
29 Mar 179047.5AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Sep 181371.0DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mateo Aguiriano Gómez
Bishop Francisco Mateo Aguiriano Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlesanco

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139, and Page 399
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 92, Number 475
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Apr 2018