Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo de Vergara

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1467AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
6 Oct 1469AppointedBishop of León, Spain
18 Jun 1478DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Vergara
Bishop Rodrigo de Vergara (died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 10
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,807
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 309, Number 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1467, Number 30*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 258, and Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast