Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Cos y Soberón

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1777BornSan Felices de Castillería
16 Mar 184871.2SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
3 Jul 184871.5ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
18 Oct 184871.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
15 Dec 184872.0DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Cos y Soberón:
Bishop Gaspar Cos y Soberón (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 858

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013