Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo Mena Roelas

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1373AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
11 Aug 1382AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Jan 1394AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
21 Apr 1401DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Mena Roelas:
Archbishop Gonzalo Mena Roelas (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 278, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014