Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando de Lobo Castrillo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590²BornNavarrete, Spain
9 Dec 164959.9AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
26 Jul 165060.6Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
17 Oct 165161.8DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hernando de Lobo Castrillo:
Bishop Hernando de Lobo Castrillo O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 180, Number 1,121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013