Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Plaza y García

Deceased

Bishop of Santander


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1864BornHortezuela de Océn
4 Jun 188722.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 191147.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
27 Aug 191349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
27 Dec 191349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
16 Dec 192056.3AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
10 Jul 192762.8DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Plaza y García:
Bishop Juan Plaza y García (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 74
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013