Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bernal Díaz de Luco

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1495Born
17 Apr 154549.6AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
31 May 154549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
6 Sep 155661.0DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bernal Díaz de Luco (VIAF: 316410871)
Bishop Juan Bernal Díaz de Luco (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Death PlaceCalahorra, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 56, Number 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 145
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast